NY A06850 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that local assessor offices no longer must add a code to notification forms for creation of termination of a mortgage escrow account.
Title
Provides that local assessor offices no longer must add a code to notification forms for creation of termination of a mortgage escrow account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | print number 6850a |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S01823 (Same As) 2022-05-09 - PRINT NUMBER 1823A