NY A06795 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - substituted by s6879a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - substituted by s6879a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers the village of West Carthage housing authority to the town of Wilna housing authority.
Title
Transfers the village of West Carthage housing authority to the town of Wilna housing authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | Assembly | substituted by s6879a |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.793 |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2023-05-19 | Assembly | print number 6795a |
2023-05-19 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to housing |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S06879 (Same As) 2023-10-25 - SIGNED CHAP.599