NY S06879 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - SIGNED CHAP.599
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Transfers the village of West Carthage housing authority to the town of Wilna housing authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transfers the village of West Carthage housing authority to the town of Wilna housing authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-25SenateSIGNED CHAP.599
2023-10-13SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2023-06-09Assemblyreturned to senate
2023-06-09Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-09Assemblyhome rule request
2023-06-09Assemblyhome rule request
2023-06-09Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.793
2023-06-09Assemblysubstituted for a6795a
2023-06-08Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2023-06-08SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-05-24SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-23Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-05-23SenateAMENDED (T) 6879A
2023-05-22Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1166
2023-05-12SenateREFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT

Same As/Similar To

A06795 (Same As) 2023-06-09 - substituted by s6879a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback