NY A06740 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s6171b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s6171b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to funeral entities and the operation of any crematory or crematorium; permits a crematory operated by a funeral entity in the town of Tonawanda, that has been subject to a consent order issued by the department of environmental conservation, to relocate existing operations subject to local authority approval.
Title
Relates to funeral entities and the operation of any crematory or crematorium; permits a crematory operated by a funeral entity in the town of Tonawanda, that has been subject to a consent order issued by the department of environmental conservation, to relocate existing operations subject to local authority approval.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s6171b |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.590 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | print number 6740a |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-03-29 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S06171 (Same As) 2021-10-25 - SIGNED CHAP.513