NY S06171 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - SIGNED CHAP.513
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - SIGNED CHAP.513
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to funeral entities and the operation of any crematory or crematorium; permits a crematory operated by a funeral entity in the town of Tonawanda, that has been subject to a consent order issued by the department of environmental conservation, to relocate existing operations subject to local authority approval.
Title
Relates to funeral entities and the operation of any crematory or crematorium; permits a crematory operated by a funeral entity in the town of Tonawanda, that has been subject to a consent order issued by the department of environmental conservation, to relocate existing operations subject to local authority approval.
Sponsors
Sen. Sean Ryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-25 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.513 |
2021-10-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.590 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a6740a |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1388 |
2021-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6171B |
2021-05-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2021-05-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6171A |
2021-05-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2021-04-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06740 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - substituted by s6171b