NY A06736 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-29 - print number 6736a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-29 - print number 6736a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the hiring and promotion of employees on a permanent basis at municipal and/or authority owned or operated airports.
Title
Authorizes the hiring and promotion of employees on a permanent basis at municipal and/or authority owned or operated airports.
Sponsors
Asm. William Magnarelli [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] | Asm. Christopher Burdick [D] |
Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Assembly | print number 6736a |
2024-02-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S08611 (Same As) 2024-02-21 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS