NY A06727 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - substituted by s6493c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - substituted by s6493c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the name and powers of the Oriskany Volunteer Exempt Firemen's Association of Oriskany, county of Oneida; changes the name to the Oriskany Volunteer Exempt Firefighters' Benevolent Association of Oriskany, county of Oneida and makes conforming changes; expands the powers of such association.
Title
Relates to the name and powers of the Oriskany Volunteer Exempt Firemen's Association of Oriskany, county of Oneida; changes the name to the Oriskany Volunteer Exempt Firefighters' Benevolent Association of Oriskany, county of Oneida and makes conforming changes; expands the powers of such association.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | Assembly | substituted by s6493c |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.770 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.770 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | print number 6727d |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | print number 6727c |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | print number 6727b |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | print number 6727a |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06493 (Same As) 2023-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.450