NY S06493 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.450
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.450
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the name and powers of the Oriskany Volunteer Exempt Firemen's Association of Oriskany, county of Oneida; changes the name to the Oriskany Volunteer Exempt Firefighters' Benevolent Association of Oriskany, county of Oneida and makes conforming changes; expands the powers of such association.
Title
Relates to the name and powers of the Oriskany Volunteer Exempt Firemen's Association of Oriskany, county of Oneida; changes the name to the Oriskany Volunteer Exempt Firefighters' Benevolent Association of Oriskany, county of Oneida and makes conforming changes; expands the powers of such association.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-15 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.450 |
2023-09-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.770 |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a6727d |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-06 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6493C |
2023-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6493B |
2023-05-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-30 | Senate | AMENDED 6493A |
2023-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1297 |
2023-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06727 (Same As) 2023-06-09 - substituted by s6493c