TN SB2610 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Effective date(s) 05/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Effective date(s) 05/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes a Class E felony for an entity that is supported in whole or in part by public funds to knowingly provide meeting spaces or other forums, including electronic and print platforms, to certain groups or organizations for the purpose of soliciting material support, recruiting new members, or encouraging violent action. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 13, relative to the support of terrorist organizations.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] |
Sen. Adam Lowe [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | Effective date(s) 05/01/2024 | |
2024-05-13 | Pub. Ch. 872 | |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 69, Nays 22, PNV 0 |
2024-04-16 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0677) |
2024-04-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 1, PNV 3 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0923) |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/11/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2348 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 872