NY A06689 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a deduction from personal gross income for expenses incurred in the adoption of a child in the foster care system.
Title
Provides for a deduction from personal gross income for expenses incurred in the adoption of a child in the foster care system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-06 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-03-15 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05084 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE