NY A06666 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-05 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-05 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that any claimant who has received certain unemployment benefits to which they were not entitled shall not be held liable for the amounts overpaid provided certain conditions exist.
Title
Provides that any claimant who has received certain unemployment benefits to which they were not entitled shall not be held liable for the amounts overpaid provided certain conditions exist.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.222 |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.376 |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | reported |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S06169 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO LABOR