NY A06538 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to health care and wellness education and outreach programs for preventing sudden cardiac arrest among student athletes including recommending evidenced-based best practices for health certificates required pursuant to the education law, screening exams required for participation in interscholastic athletics, and information for students and their parents and guardians regarding sudden cardiac arrest.
Title
Relates to health care and wellness education and outreach programs for preventing sudden cardiac arrest among student athletes including recommending evidenced-based best practices for health certificates required pursuant to the education law, screening exams required for participation in interscholastic athletics, and information for students and their parents and guardians regarding sudden cardiac arrest.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael Cusick [D] | Asm. Marcos Crespo [D] | Asm. Matthew Titone [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] |
Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | amended on third reading 6538a |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.463 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.351 |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S03149 (Same As) 2018-05-31 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE