NY S03149 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to health care and wellness education and outreach programs for preventing sudden cardiac arrest among student athletes including recommending evidenced-based best practices for health certificates required pursuant to the education law, screening exams required for participation in interscholastic athletics, and information for students and their parents and guardians regarding sudden cardiac arrest.
Title
Relates to health care and wellness education and outreach programs for preventing sudden cardiac arrest among student athletes including recommending evidenced-based best practices for health certificates required pursuant to the education law, screening exams required for participation in interscholastic athletics, and information for students and their parents and guardians regarding sudden cardiac arrest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-02-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3149A |
2018-02-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1141 |
2017-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A06538 (Same As) 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO HEALTH