NY A06489 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-03 - amended on third reading 6489b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-03 - amended on third reading 6489b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to correctional facility visits by the correctional association; authorizes the correctional association to visit correctional facilities at any time and without advance notice; grants the correctional association access to certain records and information of correctional facilities.
Title
Relates to correctional facility visits by the correctional association; authorizes the correctional association to visit correctional facilities at any time and without advance notice; grants the correctional association access to certain records and information of correctional facilities.
Sponsors
Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Kenneth Burgos [D] | Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D] | Asm. Pamela Hunter [D] |
Asm. Christopher Burdick [D] | Asm. Jessica Gonzalez-Rojas [D] | Asm. Demond Meeks [D] | Asm. Anna Kelles [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Assembly | amended on third reading 6489b |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.166 |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | rules report cal.166 |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | reported |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | print number 6489a |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to correction |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2023-04-11 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S00312 (Same As) 2024-05-29 - PRINT NUMBER 312B