NY S00312 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - PRINT NUMBER 312B
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - PRINT NUMBER 312B
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to correctional facility visits by the correctional association; authorizes the correctional association to visit correctional facilities at any time and without advance notice; grants the correctional association access to certain records and information of correctional facilities.
Title
Relates to correctional facility visits by the correctional association; authorizes the correctional association to visit correctional facilities at any time and without advance notice; grants the correctional association access to certain records and information of correctional facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Julia Salazar [D] | Sen. Jabari Brisport [D] | Sen. Cordell Cleare [D] | Sen. Nathalia Fernandez [D] |
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 312B |
2024-05-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2024-01-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 312A |
2024-01-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2023-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A06489 (Same As) 2024-06-03 - amended on third reading 6489b