NY A06390 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-15 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-15 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a temporary state commission to study and investigate the effects of closures of long term care facilities on the residents of such facilities and their families.
Title
Creates a temporary state commission to study and investigate the effects of closures of long term care facilities on the residents of such facilities and their families.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-03-09 | Assembly | print number 6390a |
2016-03-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to aging |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S02472 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO AGING