NY A06281 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent certain provisions relating to citizenship requirements for permanent certification as a teacher.
Title
Makes permanent certain provisions relating to citizenship requirements for permanent certification as a teacher.
Sponsors
Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.445 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.535 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | print number 6281a |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S04516 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION