NY A06280 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-16 - amended on third reading 6280a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-16 - amended on third reading 6280a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing a product stewardship program for primary batteries.
Title
Relates to establishing a product stewardship program for primary batteries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 113 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-16 | Assembly | amended on third reading 6280a |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.444 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-04-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.63 |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.63 |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S01448 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - PRINT NUMBER 1448A