IL HB5421 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Rivers, Lakes, and Streams Act. Removes a provision requiring the Environmental Protection Agency to work with the City of Chicago and affected units of government for specified concerns. Removes a provision that require the Environmental Protection Agency to conduct water quality and lake bed surveys to evaluate the ecology and the quality of water in Lake Michigan. Removes a provision concerning reporting requirements. Provides that the Environmental Protection Agency shall regularly monitor water quality from nearshores, harbors, and public water supply intakes in Lake Michigan and provide an executive summary biennially on conditions of the water quality in Lake Michigan to the Governor and members of the General Assembly.
Title
LAKE MICH MONITORING-REPORTING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 026-000-000 |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
615 | 5 | 14a | Amended Code | Citation Text |