IL HB5627 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Funeral or Burial Funds Act. Defines the term "transportation protection agreement". Provides that the Illinois Insurance Code does not apply to any transportation protection agreement sold by any seller. Provides that nothing in the Act shall be deemed to apply to (1) merchandise that is delivered within 30 days of purchase, (2) a transportation protection agreement, or (3) pre-need cemetery sales (currently only pre-need cemetery sales) under the Illinois Pre-Need Cemetery Sales Act. Makes a change to a provision concerning payments under pre-need contracts.
Title
BURIAL TRANSPORT AGREEMENTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024 |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024 |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 45 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 45 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 45 | 1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 45 | 2c | New Code | See Bill Text |