NY S01448 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - PRINT NUMBER 1448A
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - PRINT NUMBER 1448A
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing a product stewardship program for primary batteries.
Title
Relates to establishing a product stewardship program for primary batteries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1448A |
2018-01-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2017-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06280 (Same As) 2018-01-16 - amended on third reading 6280a