NY A06229 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.438
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.438
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the revocatory effect of divorce.
Title
Relates to the revocatory effect of divorce.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.438 |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.230 |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-28 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S06503 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY