NY A06084 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on November 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-10 - approval memo.18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on November 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-10 - approval memo.18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits Gold Star families to use any of the public campsites, parks and other public places of recreation in this state free of charge; defines "veteran".
Title
Permits Gold Star families to use any of the public campsites, parks and other public places of recreation in this state free of charge; defines "veteran".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-10 | Assembly | approval memo.18 |
2023-11-10 | Assembly | signed chap.616 |
2023-11-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1471 |
2023-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3309A |
2023-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.260 |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.260 |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | print number 6084a |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S03309 (Same As) 2023-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6084A