NY A05990 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-6)
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - VETOED MEMO.146
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - VETOED MEMO.146
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the rate paid by the state to a city for maintenance and repair of highways.
Title
Relates to the rate paid by the state to a city for maintenance and repair of highways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.146 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.546 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a5990a |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1544 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 4048A |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s4048a |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.546 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.546 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | print number 5990a |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S04048 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - VETOED MEMO.146
A08895 (Same As) 2020-02-04 - reported referred to ways and means
A08895 (Same As) 2020-02-04 - reported referred to ways and means