NY A05885 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the statute of limitations for criminal prosecution of a sexual offense committed against a child shall not begin to run until the child turns 23 years of age; provides that a civil action for conduct constituting a sexual offense against a child, shall be brought before the child turns 50 years of age; revives previously barred actions related to sexual abuse of children; grants civil trial preference to such actions; eliminates the notice of claim requirements for such actions when the action is brought against a municipality, the state or a school district; requires judicial training relating to child abuse and the establishment of rules relating to civil actions brought for sexual offenses committed against children.
Title
Provides that the statute of limitations for criminal prosecution of a sexual offense committed against a child shall not begin to run until the child turns 23 years of age; provides that a civil action for conduct constituting a sexual offense against a child, shall be brought before the child turns 50 years of age; revives previously barred actions related to sexual abuse of children; grants civil trial preference to such actions; eliminates the notice of claim requirements for such actions when the action is brought against a municipality, the state or a school district; requires judicial training relating to child abuse and the establishment of rules relating to civil actions brought for sexual offenses committed against children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.420 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.113 |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.113 |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | print number 5885a |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06575 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES
A08421 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to codes
S06722 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES
A08421 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to codes
S06722 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES