NY A05847 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - approval memo.104
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - approval memo.104
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to antimicrobial resistance prevention and education; requires every general hospital and nursing home to establish and implement an antimicrobial stewardship program and establish and implement training regarding antimicrobial resistance and infection prevention and control.
Title
Relates to antimicrobial resistance prevention and education; requires every general hospital and nursing home to establish and implement an antimicrobial stewardship program and establish and implement training regarding antimicrobial resistance and infection prevention and control.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Assembly | approval memo.104 |
2021-12-22 | Assembly | signed chap.737 |
2021-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-03-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.353 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2191 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.31 |
2021-03-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.31 |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-02-26 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S02191 (Same As) 2021-03-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5847