NY S02191 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5847
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5847
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to antimicrobial resistance prevention and education; requires every general hospital and nursing home to establish and implement an antimicrobial stewardship program and establish and implement training regarding antimicrobial resistance and infection prevention and control.
Title
Relates to antimicrobial resistance prevention and education; requires every general hospital and nursing home to establish and implement an antimicrobial stewardship program and establish and implement training regarding antimicrobial resistance and infection prevention and control.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5847 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.353 |
2021-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A05847 (Same As) 2021-12-22 - approval memo.104