NY A05837 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - signed chap.376
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to a referee's compensation; increases a referee's compensation generally to three hundred fifty dollars and upon a sale of real property pursuant to a judgment to seven hundred fifty dollars.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to a referee's compensation; increases a referee's compensation generally to three hundred fifty dollars and upon a sale of real property pursuant to a judgment to seven hundred fifty dollars.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21Senatesigned chap.376
2018-12-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1961
2018-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8351
2018-05-02SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2018-05-02Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-05-02Assemblypassed assembly
2018-04-26Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.790
2018-04-24Assemblyreported
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2017-02-16Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S08351 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5837

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback