NY A05771 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - print number 5771a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - print number 5771a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Joseph DelGiorno's eligibility to apply for a military service credit for his service in the Korean conflict.
Title
Authorizes Joseph DelGiorno's eligibility to apply for a military service credit for his service in the Korean conflict.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Assembly | print number 5771a |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04106 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - PRINT NUMBER 4106A