NY A05719 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-8)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - signed chap.91
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-8)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - signed chap.91
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the chief administrator of the courts to establish veterans treatment courts; relates to the removal of certain actions to veterans treatment courts.
Title
Authorizes the chief administrator of the courts to establish veterans treatment courts; relates to the removal of certain actions to veterans treatment courts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Assembly | signed chap.91 |
2021-03-29 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-03-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-24 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.409 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1957A |
2021-03-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.41 |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.41 |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | reported |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | print number 5719a |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S01957 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5719A