NY S01957 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5719A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5719A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the chief administrator of the courts to establish veterans treatment courts; relates to the removal of certain actions to veterans treatment courts.
Title
Authorizes the chief administrator of the courts to establish veterans treatment courts; relates to the removal of certain actions to veterans treatment courts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5719A |
2021-03-18 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1957A |
2021-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.409 |
2021-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A05719 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - signed chap.91