NY A05679 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s2322
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s2322
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the city of New Rochelle to impose an additional sales and compensating use tax.
Title
Extends the authority of the city of New Rochelle to impose an additional sales and compensating use tax.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s2322 |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.369 |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | reported |
2015-03-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S02322 (Same As) 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.274