NY A05627 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an authorized lender which seeks to foreclose upon a reverse mortgage issued under the federal home equity conversion mortgage program to provide notice thereof to the department of financial services and to the mortgagor; directs such department to provide notice to the mortgagor of legal service organizations which may assist them with the default or foreclosure; prohibits authorized lenders from making advance payment of debts upon the mortgaged real property.
Title
Requires an authorized lender which seeks to foreclose upon a reverse mortgage issued under the federal home equity conversion mortgage program to provide notice thereof to the department of financial services and to the mortgagor; directs such department to provide notice to the mortgagor of legal service organizations which may assist them with the default or foreclosure; prohibits authorized lenders from making advance payment of debts upon the mortgaged real property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.43 |
2020-12-15 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.337 |
2020-12-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.230 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | substituted for a5627 |
2020-01-29 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2020-01-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.225 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2020-01-08 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Senate | died in assembly |
2019-05-21 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.742 |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | REFERRED TO AGING |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | substituted by s4408 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.230 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S04408 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.43