NY A05456 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - signed chap.288
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - signed chap.288
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Jamestown to set the fee for issuance of birth and death certificates.
Title
Authorizes the city of Jamestown to set the fee for issuance of birth and death certificates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 123 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 123 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Senate | signed chap.288 |
2020-11-18 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.851 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8224 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5456a |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.207 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.519 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08224 (Same As) 2020-11-27 - signed chap.288