NY A05399 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - signed chap.323
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - signed chap.323
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the city of Beacon to sell its excess sewage capacity to private corporations and individuals outside of the city limits.
Title
Allows the city of Beacon to sell its excess sewage capacity to private corporations and individuals outside of the city limits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-02 | Assembly | signed chap.323 |
2021-07-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-08 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1491 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5300 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 2 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.117 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | rules report cal.117 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S05300 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5399