NY S05300 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5399
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5399
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the city of Beacon to sell its excess sewage capacity to private corporations and individuals outside of the city limits.
Title
Allows the city of Beacon to sell its excess sewage capacity to private corporations and individuals outside of the city limits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5399 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1491 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 2 |
Same As/Similar To
A05399 (Same As) 2021-08-02 - signed chap.323