NY A05127 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - substituted by s1239
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - substituted by s1239
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing the administration of prescribed glucagon or epinephrine auto injectors in emergency situations by trained unlicensed school personnel.
Title
Relates to allowing the administration of prescribed glucagon or epinephrine auto injectors in emergency situations by trained unlicensed school personnel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | Assembly | substituted by s1239 |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.132 |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | reported |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S01239 (Same As) 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.339