NY S01239 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.339
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to allowing the administration of prescribed glucagon or epinephrine auto injectors in emergency situations by trained unlicensed school personnel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to allowing the administration of prescribed glucagon or epinephrine auto injectors in emergency situations by trained unlicensed school personnel.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-02AssemblySIGNED CHAP.339
2021-07-21SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2021-03-08Assemblyreturned to senate
2021-03-08Assemblypassed assembly
2021-03-08Assemblyordered to third reading cal.132
2021-03-08Assemblysubstituted for a5127
2021-03-01Assemblyreferred to education
2021-03-01SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-03-01SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-02-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-02-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-02-02Senate1ST REPORT CAL.243
2021-01-08SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A05127 (Same As) 2021-03-08 - substituted by s1239

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback