NY A05054 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-30 - REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
Pending: Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-30 - REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
Pending: Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates minority and women-owned business enterprise regional advocates; provides that the advocates will help ensure that municipal agencies comply with the provisions of law relating to minority and women-owned business enterprises.
Title
Creates minority and women-owned business enterprise regional advocates; provides that the advocates will help ensure that municipal agencies comply with the provisions of law relating to minority and women-owned business enterprises.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-05-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.629 |
2012-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2012-02-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to small business |
2011-05-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.324 |
2011-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2011-04-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-02-11 | Assembly | referred to small business |