NY A05010 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Passed on October 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - signed chap.551
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Passed on October 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - signed chap.551
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of corporal punishment, as defined by the commissioner of education, in schools.
Title
Prohibits the use of corporal punishment, as defined by the commissioner of education, in schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-25 | Assembly | signed chap.551 |
2023-10-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1493 |
2023-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5261A |
2023-04-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.140 |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | reported |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | print number 5010a |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2023-02-27 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05261 (Same As) 2023-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5010A