NY A04921 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the requirements of surrogacy programs and criteria for surrogacy arrangements.
Title
Relates to the requirements of surrogacy programs and criteria for surrogacy arrangements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-30 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.941 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5107C |
2024-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.424 |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | reported |
2024-03-07 | Assembly | print number 4921c |
2024-03-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | print number 4921b |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | print number 4921a |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to rules |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-02-27 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05107 (Same As) 2024-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4921C