NY A04921 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - SIGNED CHAP.338
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - SIGNED CHAP.338
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of economic development to publicize certain information related to programs for small business enterprises and minority and women-owned business enterprises.
Title
Requires the commissioner of economic development to publicize certain information related to programs for small business enterprises and minority and women-owned business enterprises.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael Blake [D] | Asm. Clyde Vanel [D] | Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D] | Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] |
Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.338 |
2020-12-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.158 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | substituted for a4921 |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2020-02-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.155 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Senate | died in assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | referred to economic development |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.954 |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | substituted by s4429 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.158 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | reference changed to small business |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S04429 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - SIGNED CHAP.338