NY A04755 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the prevention and mitigation of marine and coastal debris; defines terms; requires the department of environmental conservation to prepare and annually update a marine and coastal debris action plan.
Title
Relates to the prevention and mitigation of marine and coastal debris; defines terms; requires the department of environmental conservation to prepare and annually update a marine and coastal debris action plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07693 (Same As) 2020-02-07 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION