NY A04690 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - signed chap.195
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - signed chap.195
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Regulates the manufacturing, sale, branding and labeling of beech sugar and beech syrup; defines beech sugar and beech syrup.
Title
Regulates the manufacturing, sale, branding and labeling of beech sugar and beech syrup; defines beech sugar and beech syrup.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | Assembly | signed chap.195 |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-05-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-03 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.738 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5751 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.172 |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S05751 (Same As) 2021-05-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4690