NY A04611 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - approval memo.34
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the ability of continuing care retirement communities to offer seniors additional service options.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the ability of continuing care retirement communities to offer seniors additional service options.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-29Senateapproval memo.34
2014-12-29Senatesigned chap.549
2014-12-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2014-05-28SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-05-28SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-05-20Senate3RD READING CAL.557
2014-05-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2118B
2014-05-05SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2014-05-05Assemblydelivered to senate
2014-05-05Assemblypassed assembly
2014-05-01Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.601
2014-04-29Assemblyreported
2014-02-27Assemblyprint number 4611b
2014-02-27Assemblyamend and recommit to health
2014-01-08Assemblyreferred to health
2013-06-17Assemblyprint number 4611a
2013-06-17Assemblyamend and recommit to health
2013-02-06Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S02118 (Same As) 2014-05-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4611B

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback