NY S02118 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4611B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4611B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the ability of continuing care retirement communities to offer seniors additional service options.
Title
Relates to the ability of continuing care retirement communities to offer seniors additional service options.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4611B |
2014-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.557 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2118B |
2014-02-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2013-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-18 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2118A |
2013-06-18 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | referred to health |
2013-03-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-03-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-02-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-02-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.50 |
2013-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A04611 (Same As) 2014-12-29 - approval memo.34