NY A04505 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the offense of unauthorized use of a vehicle in third degree.
Title
Relates to the offense of unauthorized use of a vehicle in third degree.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | held for consideration in codes |
2015-02-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S00422 (Same As) 2016-05-16 - referred to codes