NY A04499 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Waives the ability of government agencies in New York to claim copyright protection except where the record reflects artistic, creative or scholarly works of authorship, academic course materials, or scientific or academic research, or if the copyright owner intends to distribute the record of derivative work based on it to the public by sale or other transfer of ownership.
Title
Waives the ability of government agencies in New York to claim copyright protection except where the record reflects artistic, creative or scholarly works of authorship, academic course materials, or scientific or academic research, or if the copyright owner intends to distribute the record of derivative work based on it to the public by sale or other transfer of ownership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4499a |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.150 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-03-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.129 |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | reported |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S03988 (Same As) 2022-03-28 - PRINT NUMBER 3988A