NY A04467 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes the financial exploitation of the elderly or disabled within the definition of the crime of larceny; defines terms.
Title
Includes the financial exploitation of the elderly or disabled within the definition of the crime of larceny; defines terms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-02-02 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S01417 (Same As) 2016-05-10 - referred to codes