NY A04386 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s23b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s23b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the construction of certain parking facilities to be capable of supporting electric vehicle charging stations.
Title
Requires the construction of certain parking facilities to be capable of supporting electric vehicle charging stations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s23b |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.679 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | print number 4386b |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-05-07 | Assembly | print number 4386a |
2021-05-07 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S00023 (Same As) 2022-12-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.92